**Download Multiplication Worksheets Grade 4**

**Q.1) 7 x 4 = ?**

a) 28

b) 21

c) 14

**Q.2) 9 x 8 = ?**

a) 72

b) 63

c) 54

**Q.3) 15 x 9 = ?**

a) 120

b) 135

c) 150

**Q.4) 14 x 8 = ?**

a) 140

b) 126

c) 112

**Q.5) Which of the following equations shows the Associative Property of Multiplication?**

a) 14 x 6 = 6 x 14

b) 6 x 1 = 6

c) ( 14 x 6 ) x 18 = 14 x ( 6 x 18 )

**Q.6) Which of the following equations shows the Commutative Property of Multiplication?**

a) ( 20 x 12 ) x 8 = 20 x ( 12 x 8 )

b) 12 x 20 = 20 x 12

c) 20 x 1 = 20

**Q.7) Find the product :**

**14 x 200 = ?**

a) 2800

b) 280

c) 1400

**Q.8) Find the product. **

**5346 x 3 = ?**

a) 15620

b) 15754

c) 16038

**Q.9) Find the product.**

**324 x 25**

a) 8100

b) 7920

c) 8420

**Q.1) Explanation – Multiplication Worksheets Grade 4**

According to the Table of 7

If we look at the Table, we would get 7 x 4 = 28

**Correct Answer – a) 28**

**Q.2) Explanation -Multiplication Worksheets Grade 4**

According to the Table of 9

If we look at the Table, we would get 9 x 8 = 72

**Correct Answer – a) 72**

**Q.3) Explanation – Multiplication Worksheets Grade 4**

According to the Table of 15

If we look at the Table, we would get 15 x 9 = 135

**Correct Answer – b) 135**

**Q.4) Explanation – Multiplication Worksheets Grade 4**

According to the Table of 14

If we look at the Table, we would get 14 x 8 = 112

**Correct Answer – c) 112**

**Q.5) Explanation – Multiplication Worksheets Grade 4**

According to the Associative Property of Multiplication, if we multiply more than two numbers, they can be grouped but the product remains the same i.e,

(a x b) x c = a x (b x c)

Hence, ( 14 x 6 ) x 18 = 14 x ( 6 x 18 ) satisfies Associative Property of Multiplication.

**Correct Answer – c) ( 14 x 6 ) x 18 = 14 x ( 6 x 18 )**

**Q.6) Explanation – Multiplication Worksheets Grade 4**

According to the Commutative Property of Multiplication, if we change the order of Multiplicand and Multiplier, the product remains the same i.e,

a x b = b x a

Hence, 12 x 20 = 20 x 12 satisfies Commutative Property of Multiplication.

**Correct Answer – b) 12 x 20 = 20 x 12**

**Q.7) Explanation – Multiplication Worksheets Grade 4**

To Multiply a given number with a Multiplier having zero at the end, we first count the number of zeros.

In 200 there are 2 zeros

Now we would multiply, the remaining digits of the given numbers, excluding zeros

i.e

Multiplying 14 by 2

14 x 2 = 28

Add 2 zeros after the product 28

The number would be 2800

Hence

14 x 200 = 2800

**Correct Answer – a) 2800**

**Q.8) Explanation – Multiplication Worksheets Grade 4**

Step I: Multiply 6 in ones place with 3

6 x 3 = 18

Since, the number is more than 9, we need to carry over 1 to the tens place.

Write 8 in ones place.

Step II: Multiply 4 in tens place with 3

4 x 3 = 12

Add the carry over of 1 to 12

12 + 1 = 13

Since, the number is more than 9, we need to carry over 1 to the hundreds place.

Write 3 in tens place.

Step III: Multiply 3 in hundreds place with 3

3 x 3 = 9

Add the carry over of 1 to 9

9 + 1 = 10

Since, the number is more than 9, we need to carry over 1 to the thousands place.

Write 0 in hundreds place.

Step IV: Multiply 5 in thousands place with 3

5 x 3 = 15

Add the carry over of 1 to 15

15 + 1 = 16

Since, the number is more than 9, we need to carry over 1 to the ten thousands place.

Write 1 in ten thousands place and 6 in thousands place.

Hence, 5346 x 3 = 16038

**Correct Answer – c) 16038**

**Q.9) Explanation – Multiplication Worksheets Grade 4**

Whenever we multiply a three digit Multiplicand with two digit Multiplier, we first multiply the Multiplicand with ones place of Multiplier, and then multiply Multiplicand with Tens place of the Multiplier.

Step I : Multiply Multiplicand with ones place of Multiplier.

i.e, 324 x 5 = 1620

Step II : Multiply Multiplicand with tens place of Multiplier.

i.e, 324 x 2 = 648

Since the Number obtained at Step II, has a Tens value, we add a “0” or “x” at the end of the answer obtained by multiplying Multiplicand with Tens place of the Multiplier.

Step III : Add both the numbers

Hence, 324 x 25 = 8100

**Correct Answer – a) 8100**

### Free and Printable Worksheets for Class 4

- Addition Worksheets for Grade 4
- Subtraction Worksheets for Grade 4
- Division Worksheets Grade 4
- Fractions Worksheets Grade 4
- Factors and Multiples Worksheet Grade 4
- Unitary Method Worksheet Grade 4
- Metric Measures Worksheets for Class 4
- Time Worksheets Grade 4
- Money Worksheets Grade 4
- Data handling Worksheet for Class 4

## Leave a Reply